LA SCR42 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that monies in the Budget Stabilization Fund be available for appropriation in Fiscal Year 2009-2010. (2/3 - CA7s10.3(C)(1))
Title
Provides that monies in the Budget Stabilization Fund be available for appropriation in Fiscal Year 2009-2010. (2/3 - CA7s10.3(C)(1))
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SCR 42, MOTION TO CONCUR (#873) (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 42, ADOPT (#549) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 42, ADOPT (#549) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-19 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-18 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-17 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 2. The resolution, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was concurred in. | |
2010-05-17 | Called from the calendar. | |
2010-05-17 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 17, 2010. | |
2010-05-13 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-05-12 | Reported favorably (20-0). | |
2010-05-11 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-05-11 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-05-11 | Senate amendments were read and adopted. Read by title as amended and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |
2010-05-11 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |
2010-04-26 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-04-21 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-19 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |