LA SCR41 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-6)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the legislative auditor to review the Belle Chasse Bridge & Tunnel Replacement Public-Private Partnership Project.
Title
Requests the legislative auditor to review the Belle Chasse Bridge & Tunnel Replacement Public-Private Partnership Project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on SCR 41 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1131) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 CO-AUTHORS (#476) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 ADOPT (#475) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 CO-AUTHORS (#476) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 ADOPT (#475) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |