LA SCR41 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Law Enforcement Officer PTSD Study Commission.
Title
Creates the Law Enforcement Officer PTSD Study Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] | Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Sen. Bob Hensgens [R] |
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 CONCUR (#650) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 41 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#686) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 ADOPT (#193) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 41 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#686) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 ADOPT (#193) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2019-05-09 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |