LA SCR41 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Declares April 22, 2015, as Youth Equine Day at the Legislature.
Title
Declares April 22, 2015, as Youth Equine Day at the Legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 ADOPT (#46) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015. |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-04-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-04-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |