LA SCR41 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the United States Department of Agriculture to develop tastier food options for the National School Lunch Program.
Title
Requests the United States Department of Agriculture to develop tastier food options for the National School Lunch Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 41 ADOPT (#404) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2014. |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-04-21 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |