LA SCR4 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes June 12, 2019, as Women Veterans Day in Louisiana.
Title
Recognizes June 12, 2019, as Women Veterans Day in Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 4 ADOPT (#14) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019. |
2019-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-04-15 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2019-04-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |