LA SCR4 | 2018 | 3rd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-24 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/25/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses sincere condolences upon the death of Judge Joan Bernard Armstrong.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses sincere condolences upon the death of Judge Joan Bernard Armstrong.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 4 ADOPT (#9) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-24SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/25/2018.
2018-06-24HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-06-22SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-06-21SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2018-06-21HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2018-06-21HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2018-06-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback