LA SCR4 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests DOTD to study truck traffic on LA 1019 between LA 16 and LA 64 in Livingston Parish.
Title
Urges and requests DOTD to study truck traffic on LA 1019 between LA 16 and LA 64 in Livingston Parish.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Erdey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 4, ADOPT (#8) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18. | |
2012-05-15 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2012-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported favorably (12-0). | |
2012-03-14 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2012-03-13 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-03-13 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-03-12 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |