LA SCR39 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Braxton "B.I." Moody III on his induction into the Louisiana Political Museum and Hall of Fame.
Title
Commends Braxton "B.I." Moody III on his induction into the Louisiana Political Museum and Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 39 ADOPT (#103) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-04-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-04-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-03-31 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |