LA SCR39 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to study the most effective means to ensure the proper utilization of Attention Deficit Hyperactivity Disorder medications in Louisiana and to report its findings to the legislature.
Title
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to study the most effective means to ensure the proper utilization of Attention Deficit Hyperactivity Disorder medications in Louisiana and to report its findings to the legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-27 - House - House Vote on SCR 39 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1212) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 39 ADOPT (#284) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 39 ADOPT (#284) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-27 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. |
2014-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2014-04-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-04-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2014-04-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |