LA SCR37 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-12)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Armand "Mondo" Duplantis former Louisiana State University track athlete on setting new world indoor records for the pole vault.
Title
Commends Armand "Mondo" Duplantis former Louisiana State University track athlete on setting new world indoor records for the pole vault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 37 ADOPT (#56) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2020. |
2020-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-05-07 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |