LA SCR37 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4-3)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-4-3)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Supreme Court and the Louisiana State Bar Association review rules governing solicitation advertising by attorneys.
Title
Requests the Louisiana Supreme Court and the Louisiana State Bar Association review rules governing solicitation advertising by attorneys.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 37 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#689) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 37 ADOPT (#192) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 37 ADOPT (#192) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/30/2019. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2019-05-01 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |