LA SCR37 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends La'Keisha McKinney on being selected the 2014 Teacher of the Year.
Title
Commends La'Keisha McKinney on being selected the 2014 Teacher of the Year.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] | Sen. Troy Brown [D] | Rep. Randal Gaines [D] | Sen. Gregory Miller [R] |
Rep. Thomas Willmott [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 37 ADOPT (#118) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-04-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-03-26 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |