LA SCR36 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Anderson "Andy" W. Barham for being named one of the top ten 2014 pilots for Pilots for Patients.
Title
Commends Anderson "Andy" W. Barham for being named one of the top ten 2014 pilots for Pilots for Patients.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 36 ADOPT (#26) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/23/2015. |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-04-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-04-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |