LA SCR35 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests DOTD study the feasibility and costs to provide adequate lighting and needed maintenance on bridges on the state highway system over the Mississippi River.
Title
Requests DOTD study the feasibility and costs to provide adequate lighting and needed maintenance on bridges on the state highway system over the Mississippi River.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 35, ADOPT (#238) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/18. | |
2012-05-15 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2012-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2012. | |
2012-05-02 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-01 | Reported favorably (14-0). | |
2012-04-04 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2012-04-03 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-04-03 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-04-02 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-27 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2012-03-26 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |