LA SCR34 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Natural Resources, office of coastal management, to review permitting cycle times and to make recommendations to expedite the permitting process.
Title
Requests the Department of Natural Resources, office of coastal management, to review permitting cycle times and to make recommendations to expedite the permitting process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 34 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#946) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34 ADOPT (#378) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34 ADOPT (#378) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2021. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |