LA SCR34 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 48-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to consider eliminating the Windfall Elimination Provision (WEP) and the Government Pension Offset (GPO) Social Security benefit reductions.
Title
Memorializes Congress to consider eliminating the Windfall Elimination Provision (WEP) and the Government Pension Offset (GPO) Social Security benefit reductions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 34 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#613) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34 CO-AUTHORS (#133) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34 ADOPT (#132) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34 CO-AUTHORS (#133) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34 ADOPT (#132) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 100 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |