LA SCR34 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Randy K. Haynie upon his induction into the Louisiana Political Museum and Hall of Fame.
Title
Commends Randy K. Haynie upon his induction into the Louisiana Political Museum and Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34 ADOPT (#71) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/1/2016. |
2016-03-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-03-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-03-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |