LA SCR34 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-12 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Kenny Almond on being inducted into the Louisiana High School Basketball Coaches Association Hall of Fame.
Title
Commends Kenny Almond on being inducted into the Louisiana High School Basketball Coaches Association Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34, ADOPT (#115) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-12 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-03-29 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-03-29 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-03-28 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2012-03-27 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-03-27 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-03-26 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |