LA SCR34 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of Joe Edward Mitcham, Sr.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of Joe Edward Mitcham, Sr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 34, ADOPT (#80) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/06. | |
2010-04-14 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-04-13 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-04-12 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-04-08 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2010-04-07 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-04-07 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |