LA SCR32 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Public Safety and Corrections to publish certain prison population data on its website.
Title
Requests the Department of Public Safety and Corrections to publish certain prison population data on its website.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on SCR 32 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1411) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 ADOPT (#478) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 ADOPT (#478) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays. |
2024-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2024-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-05-06 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |