LA SCR32 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Re-creates and continues the work of the task force to study and make recommendations concerning health services delivery and financing in the Baton Rouge region.
Title
Re-creates and continues the work of the task force to study and make recommendations concerning health services delivery and financing in the Baton Rouge region.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 CONCUR (#794) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 32 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#943) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 ADOPT (#347) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 32 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#943) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32 ADOPT (#347) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-25 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-05-17 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-05-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |