LA SCR32 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires closed captioning of legislative proceedings that are broadcast.
Title
Requires closed captioning of legislative proceedings that are broadcast.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |