LA SCR32 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests DHH to study the benefits of permitting physicians to apply fluoride varnish to the teeth of children under the age of seven who are enrolled in the Medicaid program.
Title
Requests DHH to study the benefits of permitting physicians to apply fluoride varnish to the teeth of children under the age of seven who are enrolled in the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 32, ADOPT (#236) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-05-23 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-05-23 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-05-19 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-05-19 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-12 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |