LA SCR31 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests office of alcohol and tobacco control to amend administrative rules relative to the prohibition of certain unfair business practices.
Title
Requests office of alcohol and tobacco control to amend administrative rules relative to the prohibition of certain unfair business practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 31 CONCUR (#793) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 31 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#950) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 31 ADOPT (#264) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 31 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#950) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 31 ADOPT (#264) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-06-02 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-01 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-27 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |