LA SCR31 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to urge the US Army Corps of Engineers, New Orleans District, to follow the recommendations of the Louisiana Department of Natural Resources, office of coastal management, as to the implementation of fair and reasonable regulations on wetland habitat assessment and compensation for wetland impacts.
Title
Memorializes Congress to urge the US Army Corps of Engineers, New Orleans District, to follow the recommendations of the Louisiana Department of Natural Resources, office of coastal management, as to the implementation of fair and reasonable regulations on wetland habitat assessment and compensation for wetland impacts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 31, ADOPT (#484) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-28 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25. | |
2012-05-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-22 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, concurred in. | |
2012-05-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/22/2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-09 | Reported favorably (11-0-1). | |
2012-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2012-04-24 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-04-24 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-04-23 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-03-27 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | |
2012-03-26 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |