LA SCR31 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Joint Task Force 7 composed of seven sheriff offices to prevent terrorist activities.
Title
Commends the Joint Task Force 7 composed of seven sheriff offices to prevent terrorist activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 31, ADOPT (#51) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-04-12 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-04-07 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2010-04-06 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-04-06 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |