LA SCR3 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the expenditure limit for Fiscal Year 2022-2023 and Fiscal Year 2023-2024. (2/3-CA7s10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE)
Title
Provides for the expenditure limit for Fiscal Year 2022-2023 and Fiscal Year 2023-2024. (2/3-CA7s10) (EN SEE FISC NOTE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 CONCUR (#955) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1117) (Y: 85 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 To consider after the 57th calendar day (#1116) (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 2/3 vote (#934) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 TO APPROPRIATIONS AGENDA (#817) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 CO-AUTHORS (#523) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT (#522) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1117) (Y: 85 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 To consider after the 57th calendar day (#1116) (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 2/3 vote (#934) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 TO APPROPRIATIONS AGENDA (#817) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 CO-AUTHORS (#523) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT (#522) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023. |
2023-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day. |
2023-06-07 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 19. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-06-07 | House | By a vote of 85 yeas, 17 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. |
2023-06-07 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-06-05 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2023-06-05 | House | Reported with amendments (21-3). |
2023-05-31 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-05-30 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2023-05-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re-engrossed and sent to the House. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |