LA SCR3 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends certain provisions of law relative to unemployment tax increases and benefit reductions. (EN NO IMPACT OF RV See Note)
Title
Suspends certain provisions of law relative to unemployment tax increases and benefit reductions. (EN NO IMPACT OF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Reese [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 CONCUR (#487) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#671) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#143) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#671) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 FINAL PASSAGE (#143) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 89 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-05-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2021. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-17 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2021-04-29 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2021-04-28 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-04-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |