LA SCR3 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the passing of Shreveport philanthropist and art advocate, Ollie Delton Harrison Jr.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the passing of Shreveport philanthropist and art advocate, Ollie Delton Harrison Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT (#11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/17/2020. |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-03-11 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-03-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |