LA SCR3 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Senate Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs and the House Committee on House and Governmental Affairs study the possibility of requiring background checks of candidates for public office to ensure the qualification of candidates for political office.
Title
Requests the Senate Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs and the House Committee on House and Governmental Affairs study the possibility of requiring background checks of candidates for public office to ensure the qualification of candidates for political office.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 CONCUR (#1147) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1004) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT (#403) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - House - House Vote on SCR 3 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1004) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 3 ADOPT (#403) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2014-05-19 | House | Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2014. |
2014-05-15 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). |
2014-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2014-04-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |