LA SCR28 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health and Louisiana commercial health insurance payors to increase reimbursement rates for autism therapy services.
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health and Louisiana commercial health insurance payors to increase reimbursement rates for autism therapy services.
Sponsors
Sen. Franklin Foil [R] | Sen. Regina Barrow [D] | Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D] | Sen. Gary Carter [D] |
Sen. Bob Hensgens [R] | Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D] | Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - House - House Vote on SCR 28 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1290) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 28 ADOPT (#357) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 28 ADOPT (#357) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays. |
2022-05-31 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2022-04-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |