LA SCR27 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes and commends Trinity Christian Methodist Episcopal Church on its 150th anniversary and to celebrate the faith and sacrifices of its founders.
Title
Recognizes and commends Trinity Christian Methodist Episcopal Church on its 150th anniversary and to celebrate the faith and sacrifices of its founders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#219) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-04-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-04-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |