LA SCR27 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-9)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the annual state integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2020, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board.
Title
Approves the annual state integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2020, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 27 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#695) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 CO-AUTHORS (#454) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#453) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 CO-AUTHORS (#454) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#453) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/30/2019. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |