LA SCR27 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Joint Human Trafficking Study Commission.
Title
Creates the Joint Human Trafficking Study Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - House - House Vote on SCR 27 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#592) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#243) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 27 ADOPT (#243) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 89 yeas, 0 nays. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (6-0). |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |