LA SCR25 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Northwestern State University College of Nursing and Allied Health upon being selected as one of the top 100 nursing graduate programs in the nation in the latest rankings by U.S. News Media Group.
Title
Commends Northwestern State University College of Nursing and Allied Health upon being selected as one of the top 100 nursing graduate programs in the nation in the latest rankings by U.S. News Media Group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 25, ADOPT (#72) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/20. | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-05-12 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-05-10 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-05-09 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |