LA SCR23 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends certain laws relative to school closures due to COVID-19.
Title
Suspends certain laws relative to school closures due to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 23 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#551) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 23 ADOPT (#81) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 23 ADOPT (#81) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |