LA SCR22 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-10)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the Louisiana State University Board of Supervisors to name the basketball court in the PMAC after Coach Dale Brown.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the Louisiana State University Board of Supervisors to name the basketball court in the PMAC after Coach Dale Brown.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 22 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#945) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 CO-AUTHORS (#216) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 ADOPT (#215) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
2021-06-08HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-06SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
2021-06-03SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2021-06-03HouseRead by title, concurred in by vote of 93 yeas, 0 nays.
2021-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
2021-05-27HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-26HouseReported favorably (12-0).
2021-05-05HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-05-04HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2021-05-04HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2021-05-04SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2021-05-04SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2021-04-29SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-04-28SenateReported favorably.
2021-04-14SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback