LA SCR22 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests BESE to suspend statewide standardized assessments for the 2019-2020 school year due to COVID-19.
Title
Requests BESE to suspend statewide standardized assessments for the 2019-2020 school year due to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 ADOPT (#218) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |