LA SCR22 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Volunteer Louisiana Commission for its support of national service and volunteerism in Louisiana.
Title
Commends the Volunteer Louisiana Commission for its support of national service and volunteerism in Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22 ADOPT (#209) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-05-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-05-06 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-05-05 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |