LA SCR22 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of John W. Barton Sr.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of John W. Barton Sr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 22, ADOPT (#45) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-26 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-03-21 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-03-20 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-03-19 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-03-14 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2012-03-14 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |