LA SCR21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to encourage and support the reunification of Ireland.
Title
Memorializes Congress to encourage and support the reunification of Ireland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 21, ADOPT (#67) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013. |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-04-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2013-04-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |