LA SCR2 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to call for a convention of states to amend the United States Constitution to establish a limitation on terms for the members of congress.
Title
Memorializes Congress to call for a convention of states to amend the United States Constitution to establish a limitation on terms for the members of congress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - House - House Vote on SCR 2 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#987) (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#100) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#100) (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/17/2024. |
2024-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-13 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 81 yeas, 11 nays. |
2024-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2024. |
2024-05-09 | House | Notice given. |
2024-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-05-08 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024. |
2024-05-08 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-07 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2024-03-26 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 26 yeas and 10 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |