LA SCR2 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2021-2022 school year. (7/1/21) (EN +$18,763,359 EX See Note)
Title
Provides for legislative approval of the MFP formula for the 2021-2022 school year. (7/1/21) (EN +$18,763,359 EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on SCR 2 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1160) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 2/3 VOTE (#1013) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on SCR 2 TO CONSIDER AFTER THE 57TH CALENDAR DAY (#1079) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#457) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 2/3 VOTE (#1013) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on SCR 2 TO CONSIDER AFTER THE 57TH CALENDAR DAY (#1079) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#457) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-06-08 | House | Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day. |
2021-06-08 | House | By a vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day. |
2021-06-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2021. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2021-05-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Reported without action. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |