LA SCR2 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests LCTCS and Sowela administrators to work together to study the impacts of hurricanes Laura and Delta on the institution and its student body in order to inform any legislative requests for the 2021 Regular Session.
Title
Requests LCTCS and Sowela administrators to work together to study the impacts of hurricanes Laura and Delta on the institution and its student body in order to inform any legislative requests for the 2021 Regular Session.
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-15 - House - House Vote on SCR 2 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#143) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#54) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-10-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#54) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2020-10-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 10/16/2020. |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-10-15 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-10-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20. |
2020-10-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-14 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-14 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2020-10-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-10-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-10-12 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2020-09-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2020-09-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |