LA SCR2 | 2017 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/24/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for a portion of the monies in the Budget Stabilization Fund to be available for appropriation in Fiscal Year 2016-2017. (2/3 - CA7s10.3(C)(1)) (Item No. 4) (EN +$99,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for a portion of the monies in the Budget Stabilization Fund to be available for appropriation in Fiscal Year 2016-2017. (2/3 - CA7s10.3(C)(1)) (Item No. 4) (EN +$99,000,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-22 - House - House Vote on SCR 2 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#46) (Y: 92 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#48) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 AMENDMENT # 57 BY LAFLEUR SCR 2 BY MR. PRESIDENT (#47) (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/24/2017.
2017-02-22HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2017-02-22SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2017-02-22SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2017-02-22HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 9. The resolution, having the required two-thirds vote of the elected members, was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2017-02-22HouseRules suspended.
2017-02-22HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-02-21HouseReported without action, (22-0) recommit to the Committee of the Whole.
2017-02-20HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2017-02-19HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2017-02-19HouseRules suspended.
2017-02-19HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2017-02-19SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 5 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2017-02-14SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2017-02-14SenateReported without action.
2017-02-13SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=171ES&b=SCR2&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021513
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021679
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022423
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022921
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021685
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022284
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022418
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022894
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021516
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021584
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021682
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1021716
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022429
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022468
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1023205
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022965
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022419
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1022914

Bill Comments

feedback