LA SCR2 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2016-2017.
Title
Approves the Atchafalaya Basin Annual Plan for Fiscal Year 2016-2017.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House Vote on SCR 2 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#683) (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#152) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 2 ADOPT (#152) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016. |
2016-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-10 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 86 yeas, 0 nays. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2016-04-07 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-04-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |