LA SCR19 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Louisiana Sales Tax Simplification Task Force to develop a comprehensive plan to simplify Louisiana's sales tax administration and collection system. (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Louisiana Sales Tax Simplification Task Force to develop a comprehensive plan to simplify Louisiana's sales tax administration and collection system. (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 19 ADOPT (#62) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2020-06-25HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/29/20.
2020-06-25HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-25HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-25HouseReported with amendments (13-0).
2020-06-23HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2020-06-22HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-22HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-06-19SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-06-18SenateReported favorably.
2020-06-17SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback