LA SCR18 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study and make recommendations regarding reply memoranda in response to a motion for summary judgment.
Title
Requests the Louisiana State Law Institute to study and make recommendations regarding reply memoranda in response to a motion for summary judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 18 CONCUR (#693) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on SCR 18 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#881) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 18 ADOPT (#242) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House Vote on SCR 18 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#881) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 18 ADOPT (#242) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays. |
2022-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2022. |
2022-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-04-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |