LA SCR18 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 7, 2020, as "World Trade Day", celebrates the influence of international commerce on the state's economic health, vitality, and growth, and expresses support for the mission of the World Trade Center of New Orleans and trade policies that benefit American consumers and businesses, and ensures that the U.S. remains competitive in global commerce.
Title
Recognizes April 7, 2020, as "World Trade Day", celebrates the influence of international commerce on the state's economic health, vitality, and growth, and expresses support for the mission of the World Trade Center of New Orleans and trade policies that benefit American consumers and businesses, and ensures that the U.S. remains competitive in global commerce.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 18 ADOPT (#32) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/15/2020. |
2020-05-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2020-03-16 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2020-03-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |